MO HB1849 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits school districts from collecting biometric information on students without the express written consent of parents or legal guardians
Title
Prohibits school districts from collecting biometric information on students without the express written consent of parents or legal guardians
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Pogue [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1849&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1849I.PDF |