MO HB1849 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding the retention of substantiated and unsubstantiated reports on the Child Abuse and Neglect Registry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding the retention of substantiated and unsubstantiated reports on the Child Abuse and Neglect Registry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-03-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-04HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-02-25HouseReferred: Children, Families, and Persons with Disabilities(H)
2014-02-17HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-02-13HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback