MO HB1832 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes merchandising practices and credit user protection law and creates the offenses of defacing a credit card reader and illegal use of a card scanner
Title
Changes merchandising practices and credit user protection law and creates the offenses of defacing a credit card reader and illegal use of a card scanner
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1832 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 91 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1832 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1832 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 129 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: HB 1832 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1832 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 87 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1832 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 94 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1832 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 88 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1832 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1832 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 129 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: HB 1832 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1832 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 87 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1832 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 94 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1832 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 88 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-30 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (H) |
2018-05-18 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-05-18 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 129 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-18 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-05-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 8, 2018, Noon or upon morning recess, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 1, 2018, Noon or upon morning recess |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business and Industry(S) |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-28 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to merchandising practices |
2018-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |