MO HB1828 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a certification process for individuals and organizations engaged in animal care training

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a certification process for individuals and organizations engaged in animal care training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House: HB 1828 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-05SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 9, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 2
2018-03-29SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
2018-03-15HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 96 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-15HouseTaken Up
2018-03-12HousePerfected (H)
2018-03-12HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-03-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-12HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-06HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-01-30HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-17HouseReferred: Agriculture Policy(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-01-02HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback