MO HB182 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Veterans(H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Veterans(H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides federal Servicemember Civil Relief Act (SCRA) protections to National Guard members called to state duty
Title
Provides federal Servicemember Civil Relief Act (SCRA) protections to National Guard members called to state duty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |