MO HB1813 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies a provision relating to exempting neighborhood youth development programs from child care licensing provisions
Title
Modifies a provision relating to exempting neighborhood youth development programs from child care licensing provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |