MO HB1811 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Hearing Cancelled (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes villages, towns, and cities to prohibit dogs from running at large or to regulate dogs otherwise if the regulations are not breed specific

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes villages, towns, and cities to prohibit dogs from running at large or to regulate dogs otherwise if the regulations are not breed specific

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-14 - House - House: HB 1811 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-27SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2016-04-27SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S)
2016-04-21SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
2016-04-14HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2016-04-14HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 0
2016-04-14HouseTaken Up
2016-04-12HousePerfected (H)
2016-04-12HouseTaken Up
2016-02-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-24HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2016-02-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-11HouseReferred: Select Committee on General Laws(H)
2016-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2016-02-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-08HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-01-21HouseReferred: Emerging Issues(H)
2016-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2015-12-14HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback