MO HB1811 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Committee for Entrepreneurs within the Department of Economic Development and a grant program for certain accelerated computer programming programs
Title
Establishes the Committee for Entrepreneurs within the Department of Economic Development and a grant program for certain accelerated computer programming programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1811&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1811I.htm |