MO HB1803 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding school reporting requirements to law enforcement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding school reporting requirements to law enforcement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30HousePlaced Back on Perfection Calendar
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-03-13HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-15HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-12HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Special Committee to Improve the Care and Well-being of Young People(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-28HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback