MO HB1800 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes provisions of law relating to the public service commission's complaint procedure
Title
Changes provisions of law relating to the public service commission's complaint procedure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 1800 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: HB 1800 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 114 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: HB 1800 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 114 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-15 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 19 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-07 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-07 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-28 | House | Prefiled (H) |