MO HB18 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To appropriate money for purposes for the several departments and offices of state government; for projects involving the maintenance, repair, replacement, and improvement of state buildings and facilities.
Title
To appropriate money for purposes for the several departments and offices of state government; for projects involving the maintenance, repair, replacement, and improvement of state buildings and facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: HB 18 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: HB 18 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 7, 2019, 7:00pm or evening recess whichever is later, SCR 2 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-05-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-02 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-01 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-05-01 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-05-01 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-05-01 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |