MO HB1797 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Referred: Rules(H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that filing a petition for trial de novo results in the stay of the driver's license suspension or revocation order and the issuance of a temporary license until a final order is issued

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies that filing a petition for trial de novo results in the stay of the driver's license suspension or revocation order and the issuance of a temporary license until a final order is issued

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-03-13HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2014-03-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2014-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-02-18HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2014-02-11HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-02-10HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback