MO HB1779 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding mental health facility safety
Title
Changes the laws regarding mental health facility safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-20 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 143 |
2014-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 151 |
2014-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 1 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-28 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 |
2014-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 126 |
2014-03-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred: Health Care Policy(H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |