MO HB1779 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes tax increment financing in certain blighted areas that have sustained severe damage as the result of a natural disaster
Title
Authorizes tax increment financing in certain blighted areas that have sustained severe damage as the result of a natural disaster
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-03 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Economic Development (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1779&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1779I.htm |