MO HB1770 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates March 5th of each year as "Iron Curtain Speech Day" in Missouri.
Title
Designates March 5th of each year as "Iron Curtain Speech Day" in Missouri.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1770&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4428H.01I.pdf |