MO HB1769 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the offense of filing false documents

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the offense of filing false documents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-18HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 1
2018-05-18HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 132 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1
2018-05-18HouseTaken Up
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-09HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-09SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS
2018-05-08SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-08SenateTaken Up
2018-05-08SenateSEE COMMENTS - Motion to return bill from Fiscal Oversight adopted
2018-05-08SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-05-08SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-05-08SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-08SenateTaken Up
2018-03-29SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-03-15SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-03-15SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2018-03-15SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-13SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 15, 2018, 9:30am, Bingham Confernce Room
2018-03-12SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-03-08SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-03-08SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2018-02-26SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-02-22SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, February 26, 2018, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge
2018-02-21SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2018-02-01HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-01HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-01HouseTaken Up
2018-02-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-01HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-01-29HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended, HA 2, HA 3 adopted
2018-01-29HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-01-29HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-01-22HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-22HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-17HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-01-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-16HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-16HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-16HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-27HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1769&year=2018&code=R
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4534H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4534H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4534S.02C.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4534S.04F.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4534S.04T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/014.002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/017.001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/Journals/RDay6605081534-1745.pdf#1564
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/077.050.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/077.049.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback