MO HB1765 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a rebuttable presumption that child custody arrangements that award equal parenting time are in the best interest of the child.
Title
Establishes a rebuttable presumption that child custody arrangements that award equal parenting time are in the best interest of the child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |