MO HB1747 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes provisions relating to school boards
Title
Changes provisions relating to school boards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-05 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-01-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-01-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |