MO HB1744 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the filing location for school board candidates
Title
Changes the filing location for school board candidates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |