MO HB174 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the House of Representatives to review presidential orders and declare them unconstitutional
Title
Allows the House of Representatives to review presidential orders and declare them unconstitutional
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Seitz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |