MO HB1739 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the court to depart from minimum sentencing provisions in certain circumstances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows the court to depart from minimum sentencing provisions in certain circumstances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House: HB 1739 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2018-05-01HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-05-01HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-01HouseTaken Up
2018-04-30HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-04-24HousePerfected (H)
2018-04-24HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-04-24HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-04-24HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-03-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-28HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-28HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-27HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-20HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-07HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-21HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback