MO HB1735 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the sale of motorcycles, all-terrain vehicles, personal watercraft, and other motorized vehicles sold by powersports dealers on Sundays
Title
Allows for the sale of motorcycles, all-terrain vehicles, personal watercraft, and other motorized vehicles sold by powersports dealers on Sundays
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-23 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 127 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS SCS ADOPTED AYES: 125 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 4 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, upon evening recess/adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 5 |
2014-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |