MO HB1733 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a municipality to adopt a resolution or ordinance that allows all-terrain and utility vehicles to operate on the streets and highways under its jurisdiction
Title
Allows a municipality to adopt a resolution or ordinance that allows all-terrain and utility vehicles to operate on the streets and highways under its jurisdiction
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred: Agriculture Policy (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1733&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1733I.htm |