MO HB1722 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a sales tax refund for businesses that were assessed higher taxes without notice as a result of the Department of Revenue changing its interpretation of taxable items before August 28, 2015
Title
Authorizes a sales tax refund for businesses that were assessed higher taxes without notice as a result of the Department of Revenue changing its interpretation of taxable items before August 28, 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-05-02 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 28 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-08 | House | Re-referred to Committee: Budget(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |