MO HB1719 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to professional registration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to professional registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1719 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 105 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1719 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 130 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: HB 1719 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-18HouseSenate Message (S)
2018-05-18HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2018-05-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-18HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2018-05-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-17HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-17HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2018-05-17HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-17HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES GRIER, ROSS, HELMS, CARPENTER, MCGEE
2018-05-17HouseSenate Message (S)
2018-05-16HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-16HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS RIDDLE, ROWDEN, SIFTON, SCHUPP, CIERPIOT
2018-05-16HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2018-05-16HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-16HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2018-05-16HouseTaken Up
2018-05-16HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
2018-05-16HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-16HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-16HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-16SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2018-05-16SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - sa 2, sa 1 to sa 3, sa 2 to sa 3, sa 3 as amended, sa 4, sa 5 AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-16SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-05-16SenateTaken Up
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 1/SS for SCS pending
2018-05-15SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-15SenateTaken Up
2018-05-11SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-10SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-10SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-08SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 10, 2018, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2018-05-07SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-05-03SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-03SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 17, 2018, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge
2018-03-29SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Professional Registration(S)
2018-03-15HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-15HouseTaken Up
2018-03-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-13HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-03-12HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adopted
2018-03-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-12HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
2018-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-26HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-02-07HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-31HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-20HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1719&year=2018&code=R
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4489H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4489H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4489S.02C.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4489S.04F.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4489H.05S.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4489H.05T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/041.008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/Journals/RDay7205162134-2300.pdf#2212
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/077.025.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/077.024.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback