MO HB1719 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that an oversight body shall not deny a person eighteen years of age or older a license on the basis of age

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies that an oversight body shall not deny a person eighteen years of age or older a license on the basis of age

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 17, 2018, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge
2018-03-29SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Professional Registration(S)
2018-03-15HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-15HouseTaken Up
2018-03-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-13HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-03-12HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adopted
2018-03-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-12HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
2018-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-26HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-02-07HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-31HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-20HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback