MO HB1713 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Missouri Religious Freedom Protection Act"
Title
Establishes the "Missouri Religious Freedom Protection Act"
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Riley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House: HB 1713 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 13, 2022, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 97 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 4 |
2022-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-02-16 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |