MO HB1710 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the law relating to recognizing licenses to practice occupations or professions issued by other states

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the law relating to recognizing licenses to practice occupations or professions issued by other states

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-19 - House - House: HB 1710 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-03SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-03SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-02SenateExecutive Session Scheduled
2018-05-01SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-04-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-09SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-03-12SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-08SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 12, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 1
2018-03-01SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Professional Registration(S)
2018-02-19HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-19HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-19HouseTaken Up
2018-02-14HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-02-14HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-02-14HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-14HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-01HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-31HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-20HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback