MO HB1710 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Missouri National Guard Foundation Fund and authorizes a designation of tax refunds to the fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Missouri National Guard Foundation Fund and authorizes a designation of tax refunds to the fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-10SenateDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-07-10SenateApproved by Governor (G)
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-04-30SenateSenate Message (S)
2014-04-30SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31
2014-04-30SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-04-23SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2014-04-22SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2014-04-22SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2014-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1
2014-03-27SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S)
2014-03-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147
2014-03-12HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-10HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED
2014-03-10HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2014-03-10HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-02-27HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-27HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-27HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-19HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-02-19HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-11HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-02-06HouseReferred: Veterans(H)
2014-02-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-02-03HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback