MO HB1700 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the city of Springfield to levy a transient guest tax upon voter approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the city of Springfield to levy a transient guest tax upon voter approval.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House: HB 1700 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2020-05-15SenateSS Withdrawn (S) - SS#2
2020-05-15SenateTaken Up
2020-05-14SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - with SSA 1 for SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 ADOPTED/SA 4, SS#2 PENDING
2020-05-14SenateSS #2 Offered
2020-05-14SenateSS Withdrawn (S)
2020-05-14SenateTaken Up
2020-05-11SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SS for SCS and SA 1 pending
2020-05-11SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-05-11SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-05-06SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2020-05-06SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-05-04SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-04-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-29SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-28SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 12:00 pm, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Room 117
2020-02-20SenateSecond read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
2020-02-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-02-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-13HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-02-11HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2020-02-11HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-02-11HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-02-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-28HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-01-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-21HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: Local Government(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-12HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback