MO HB1693 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Motion to Adopt Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the monitoring of certain controlled substances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the monitoring of certain controlled substances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-13 - House - House: HB 1693 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: HB 1693 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: HB 1693 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 58 N: 87 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2020-05-11 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 1 HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 32 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 78 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 65 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 95 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15HouseMotion to Adopt Withdrawn
2020-05-15HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2020-05-15HouseTaken Up
2020-05-13HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-13HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-13HouseTaken Up
2020-05-13HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-05-12HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-05-12HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2020-05-12HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-12HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES REHDER, STEPHENS(128), KOLKMEYER, ROBERTS(77), MCCREERY
2020-05-12HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-11HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - LUETKEMEYER, SATER, O'LAUGHLIN, RIZZO, SIFTON
2020-05-11HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2020-05-11HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-11HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede or Grant Conference (H) - SS#2 AYES: 110 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 9
2020-05-11HouseHouse Defeats - SS#2 AYES: 58 NOES: 87 PRESENT: 5
2020-05-11HouseTaken Up
2020-03-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-03-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-12HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-03-12SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS#2
2020-03-12SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 21 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-12SenateTaken Up
2020-03-12SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-03-12SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-03-12SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-03-11SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, March 12, 2020, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room
2020-03-09SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-03-09SenateSS #2 Adopted
2020-03-09SenateSS #2 Offered
2020-03-09SenateSS Withdrawn (S)
2020-03-09SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-03-09SenateTaken Up
2020-03-09SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-03-09SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-03-09SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-03-05SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Monday, March 9, 2020, 3:30pm, Bingham Conference Room
2020-03-05SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-03-02SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-02-24SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2020-02-24SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-02-20SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, February 24, 2020, 1:30pm, SCR 1
2020-02-20SenateSecond read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2020-02-17HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-02-17HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 56 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-17HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-02-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-13HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-02-12HousePerfected (H) - AYES: 95 NOES: 56 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-12HouseTaken Up
2020-02-12HouseLaid Over (H) - HA 2 pending
2020-02-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-02-12HouseTaken Up
2020-02-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-30HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-01-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-22HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-16HouseReferred: Insurance Policy(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-11HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1693&year=2020&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3237H.02I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3237H.02P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3237S.13F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3237H.14S.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/020.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/020.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/020.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/020.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/020.002.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/022.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay350312542-555.pdf#547
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/060.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/060.002.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.008.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.006.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback