MO HB1693 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Motion to Adopt Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Motion to Adopt Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the monitoring of certain controlled substances.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the monitoring of certain controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - House - House: HB 1693 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: HB 1693 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: HB 1693 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 58 N: 87 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2020-05-11 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 1 HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 32 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 78 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 65 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 95 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: HB 1693 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: HB 1693 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 58 N: 87 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2020-05-11 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 1 HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 32 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 78 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 65 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House: HB 1693 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 95 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Motion to Adopt Withdrawn |
2020-05-15 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2020-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-13 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-13 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-05-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-05-12 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2020-05-12 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-12 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES REHDER, STEPHENS(128), KOLKMEYER, ROBERTS(77), MCCREERY |
2020-05-12 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2020-05-11 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - LUETKEMEYER, SATER, O'LAUGHLIN, RIZZO, SIFTON |
2020-05-11 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2020-05-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-11 | House | House Requests Senate Recede or Grant Conference (H) - SS#2 AYES: 110 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 9 |
2020-05-11 | House | House Defeats - SS#2 AYES: 58 NOES: 87 PRESENT: 5 |
2020-05-11 | House | Taken Up |
2020-03-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 21 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Taken Up |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, March 12, 2020, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | SS #2 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | SS #2 Offered |
2020-03-09 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, March 9, 2020, 3:30pm, Bingham Conference Room |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, February 24, 2020, 1:30pm, SCR 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 56 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-02-12 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 95 NOES: 56 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Taken Up |
2020-02-12 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 2 pending |
2020-02-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |