MO HB1691 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions regarding unlawful actions by persons knowingly infected with communicable diseases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions regarding unlawful actions by persons knowingly infected with communicable diseases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-03-11HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-03-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-03-03HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-02-10HouseRe-referred to Committee: Judiciary(H)
2020-02-06HouseReferred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-11HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback