MO HB1689 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the appointment of a successor guardian or conservator
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the appointment of a successor guardian or conservator
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-20 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |