MO HB1684 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to damages in wrongful death actions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to damages in wrongful death actions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-03-12HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-02-19HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-17HouseReferred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-19HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback