MO HB1682 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to Health Care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Health Care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 1682 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 1682 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 1682 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 127 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 1682 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House: HB 1682 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2020-07-13HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2020-05-27HouseDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-05-27HouseConstitutional Objection Filed (S)
2020-05-27HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-05-27HouseConstitutional Objection Filed (H)
2020-05-15HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-15HouseEmergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 141 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 1
2020-05-15HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 125 NOES: 19 PRESENT: 2
2020-05-15HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 127 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 3
2020-05-15HouseTaken Up
2020-05-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-05-14HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-05-14SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2020-05-14SenateEmergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-14SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 4, SA 1 to SA 5, SA 5 as amended, SA 6, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10, SA 12, SA 13, SA 14, SA 1 to SA 18, SA 18 as amended, SA 19, adopted AYES: 25 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-14SenateTaken Up
2020-05-14SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-05-14SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-05-14SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-05-13SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-05-13SenateSS Adopted (S) - SS SCS, as amended
2020-05-13SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-05-13SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-05-06SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2020-05-06SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-05-06SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-05-04SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-04-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-30SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-30SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-25SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 8:00 a.m., Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Senate Chamber
2020-04-07SenateSecond read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S)
2020-03-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-03-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-12HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-03-10HousePerfected (H)
2020-03-10HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2020-03-10HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-03-10HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-03-10HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2020-02-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-12HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-02-12HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-11HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-04HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-23HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-11HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1682&year=2020&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4231H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4231H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4231H.02P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4231S.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4231S.06F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4231S.06T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/038.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay5605141125-1199.pdf#1127
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay5605141125-1199.pdf#1126
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/064.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/064.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/064.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/064.004.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback