MO HB1680 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-17 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-17 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits third class cities from imposing storm water usage fees on property owned by any church, public school, nonprofit organization, or political subdivision
Title
Prohibits third class cities from imposing storm water usage fees on property owned by any church, public school, nonprofit organization, or political subdivision
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Roorda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2010-01-20 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1680&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1680I.htm |