MO HB1679 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the tax on diapers and feminine hygiene products
Title
Reduces the tax on diapers and feminine hygiene products
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Sharp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2022-04-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |