MO HB1677 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows students to take the ACT WorkKeys assessments instead of the ACT Plus Writing assessment
Title
Allows students to take the ACT WorkKeys assessments instead of the ACT Plus Writing assessment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1677&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4051H.01I.pdf |