MO HB1677 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a person to apply to a court for the expungement of certain criminal records
Title
Authorizes a person to apply to a court for the expungement of certain criminal records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1677&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1677I.htm |