MO HB167 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions regarding unlawful actions by persons knowingly infected with communicable diseases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions regarding unlawful actions by persons knowingly infected with communicable diseases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: HB 167 (HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-01HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-04-30HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 adopted
2019-04-30HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-04-30HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-04-30HouseTaken Up
2019-04-23HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2019-04-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-16HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-04-16HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-15HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-04HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-17HouseReferred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback