MO HB1669 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes funds designated by taxpayers in an urban district as local early childhood education funds from the local tax revenue calculation used to provide funding to charter schools
Title
Excludes funds designated by taxpayers in an urban district as local early childhood education funds from the local tax revenue calculation used to provide funding to charter schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1669&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5210H.01I.pdf |