MO HB1665 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the investment of moneys by county hospitals
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the investment of moneys by county hospitals
Sponsors
Rep. Tara Peters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |