MO HB1665 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding the administration of justice

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding the administration of justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-09HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-07-09HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-16HouseSenate Message (S)
2014-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29
2014-05-16HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 28
2014-05-16HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2014-05-16HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-16HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-16HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145
2014-05-16HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 1
2014-05-16HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-05-16HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-15HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2014-05-15HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS DIXON, SCHAEFER, LAGER, JUSTUS, KEAVENY
2014-05-15HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES JONES(50), ELMER, WEBBER
2014-05-15HouseSenate Message (S)
2014-05-15HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2014-05-15HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-15HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2014-05-15HouseTaken Up
2014-05-15SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS
2014-05-15SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 29
2014-05-15SenateSS Adopted (S)
2014-05-15SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2014-05-15SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-15SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2014-05-13SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-05-06SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
2014-05-06SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-05-01SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 6, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1
2014-04-03SenateSecond read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
2014-03-31HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-31HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149
2014-03-31HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-26HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1 adopted
2014-03-26HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2014-03-26HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-03HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-03-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-27HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-25HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-02-11HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2014-01-30HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-01-29HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback