MO HB1664 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Referred: Downsizing State Government(H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Referred: Downsizing State Government(H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to visitation rights of hospital patients
Title
Creates provisions relating to visitation rights of hospital patients
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Seitz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |