MO HB1654 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limits contingency fees a private attorney may receive from contingency fee contracts with the state
Title
Limits contingency fees a private attorney may receive from contingency fee contracts with the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |