MO HB165 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures relating to counties
Title
Establishes procedures relating to counties
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Richey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: HB 165 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 165 (HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 165 (HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 6 |
2021-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, and HA 3 adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |