MO HB1645 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the film tax credit program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the film tax credit program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2016-04-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-04-05HouseReferred: Select Committee on Commerce(H)
2016-04-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-04-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2016-04-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-03-08HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-02-10HouseReferred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H)
2016-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2015-12-04HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback