MO HB1644 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding excursion gambling boat licenses, occupational licenses to work in certain jobs on a gambling boat, and licenses of suppliers of gambling equipment
Title
Changes the laws regarding excursion gambling boat licenses, occupational licenses to work in certain jobs on a gambling boat, and licenses of suppliers of gambling equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-10 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 007 | |
2012-05-18 | House Concurs (H) - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1AA ADOPTED AYES: 137 NOES: 006 | |
2012-05-17 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SA 1 TO SA 1 AND SA 1, AS AMENDED | |
2012-05-17 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1AA ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 1 | |
2012-05-17 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-15 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 & SA 1 TO SA 1 PENDING | |
2012-05-15 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-10 | Laid Over (S) | |
2012-05-10 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-03 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-01 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-05 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-03 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, APRIL 5, 8:30 AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-03-29 | Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 6 | |
2012-03-21 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-03-21 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |