MO HB1637 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the "Second Amendment Preservation Act," which creates additional protections to the right to bear arms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "Second Amendment Preservation Act," which creates additional protections to the right to bear arms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-03-11HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-10HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-03-04HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-02-13HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-06HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback